THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:18:22 AM
Habib, Mohammad Ahsan
CPSO#:
89169
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock St
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Early Intervention in Psychosis Pro
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 2550
Fax: 613-545-1364
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AHSAN HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |