THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:04:14 PM
Da Luz, Luis Teodoro
CPSO#:
89164
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Fundacao Universitaria do ABC, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery
Room H1 15
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 481-6100 Ext. 88364
Fax: (416) 481-5851
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jul 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |