THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:48:22 PM
Singh, Rittu Gill
CPSO#:
89144
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sint Eustatius, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
107 King Street West, Unit 1 (LL)
Dundas ON L9H 1V1
Phone: (289) 238-9146
Fax: (855) 368-5397
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RITTU GILL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2016 |