THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:05:02 PM
Hall, Melanie Erin
CPSO#:
89129
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON L9W1C2
Phone: 519-938-8000
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Mar 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELANIE ERIN HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2011 |