THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:32:49 AM
Dewart, Lauren Elizabeth
CPSO#:
89100
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dewart Vethanayagam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2011 to 11 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |