THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:33:00 AM
Leong, Marissa Mei Ling
CPSO#:
89084
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: 416-979-4685
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARISSA MEI LING LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2013 |