THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:19:00 AM
Zarrabian, Mohammad Mehdy
CPSO#:
89079
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055274322 Ext. 46611
Fax: +19055276214
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD MEHDY ZARRABIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARRABIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2012 to 19 Dec 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2015 |