THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:19:04 PM
Hashemi, Narges
CPSO#:
89053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Khoshnood, Narges (used until: 10 Oct 2019 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 40012 Rpo Queens Quay
Toronto ON M5V 0A4
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARGES HASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 17 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2024 to 07 Apr 2024
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2011 |