THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:08:53 PM
Khan, Luluel Maknun
CPSO#:
89045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: 905-813-3962
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LULUEL MAKNUN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2014 |