THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:12:23 AM
Braidwood, Danielle
CPSO#:
89044
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Sports Medicine Clinic
Carleton University
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Phone: 6135203510
Fax: 6135203974
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE BRAIDWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDWOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2016 |