THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:40:34 AM
Trotter, Brendon Gordon
CPSO#:
89039
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
150 Main St W
Abundance Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8P 1H8
Phone: 6476208499
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 18, 2017, Trillium Health Partners notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Brendon Trotter resigned his privileges on April 7, 2017, during the course of an investigation by Trillium Health Partners into Dr. Trotter’s conviction under the Criminal Code of Canada in November 2015 for impaired driving.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRENDON GORDON TROTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Other
Active Date: November 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Brendon Trotter was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Impaired operation, or care or control of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: November 9, 2015
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1000.