THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:22:31 PM
Levasseur, Liisa Kimberley
CPSO#:
89030
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
City of Lakes Family Health Team
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON P3Y 1J3
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIISA KIMBERLEY LEVASSEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVASSEUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 18 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |