THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:32:20 PM
Mukerji, Amit
CPSO#:
89009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main Street West, HSC-4F
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76486
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: AMIT MUKERJI MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIT MUKERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKERJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2013 |