THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:58:53 PM
Bursey, Brandy Renee
CPSO#:
88958
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brandy Bursey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:14 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2016 |