THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:55:23 AM
Temple, Sara Jane
CPSO#:
88945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite 208
Newmarket ON L3Y6P5
Phone: 905-953-8838
Fax: 905-953-8521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Nov 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARA JANE TEMPLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEMPLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2014 |