THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:54:44 PM
Walters, Leslea Angele
CPSO#:
88931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
311 Balmoral St
Winnipeg MB R3C 4A8
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLEA ANGELE WALTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2021 |