THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:34:49 PM
Tanuseputro, Peter
CPSO#:
88885
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 12, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 8, 2024, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act, that on December 12, 2023, Dr. Tanuseputro resigned his privileges effective immediately.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER TANUSEPUTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANUSEPUTRO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2010 |