THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:49:51 AM
Monroy Rodriguez, Fanny Rocio
CPSO#:
88865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health
Department of Pediatrics
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 43518
Fax: 9053237555
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FANNY ROCIO MONROY RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONROY RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |