THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:37:03 AM
Saunders, Natasha Ruth
CPSO#:
88852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATASHA RUTH SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2012 |