THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:35:50 PM
Menzies, Fiona Virginia
CPSO#:
88829
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6770
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FIONA VIRGINIA MENZIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENZIES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2013 |