THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:16:17 AM
Kassardjian, Charles Dikran
CPSO#:
88817
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
925 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5298
Fax: 416-864-6095
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES DIKRAN KASSARDJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSARDJIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2015 |