THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:58:37 PM
Jakate, Kiran Aditi
CPSO#:
88815
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5858
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRAN ADITI JAKATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKATE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2014 |