THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:59:10 PM
Caraiscos, Valerie Bessy
CPSO#:
88778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
Room 3S-376
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: 4167566024
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jan 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VALERIE BESSY CARAISCOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARAISCOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2012 |