THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:23:21 AM
Bechara, Robert
CPSO#:
88771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT BECHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECHARA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2013 |