THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:38:39 AM
Abo-El Ella, Shaimaa Mustafa Morsi
CPSO#:
88735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles ST
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-4600
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAIMAA MUSTAFA MORSI ABO-EL ELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO-EL ELLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2011 to 12 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2012 to 12 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2014 |