THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:17:54 AM
Witt, Alexandra Pearl
CPSO#:
88730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Iglesias, Alexandra Pearl (used until: 05 Apr 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PEARL WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 31 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2012 |