THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:32:44 AM
Kelly, Shawn Hamilton
CPSO#:
88694
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre
3161 Strandherd Dr.
unit 305
Ottawa ON K2J 5N1
Phone: (613) 823-5245
Fax: 613-823-0063
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN HAMILTON KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
Queen's University, 19 Nov 2013 to 02 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |