THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:26:20 AM
Elnahas, Ahmad Ibrahim
CPSO#:
88680
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of General Surgery
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3612
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMAD IBRAHIM ELNAHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELNAHAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2014 |