THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:51:47 AM
Alturkustani, Murad Abdulkareem M
CPSO#:
88671
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
01 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:01 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
PEAP - R - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2009 to 01 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Feb 2010 to 01 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2010 to 01 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2011 to 01 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2008 |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2010 |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2014 |