THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:43:24 PM
Rewa, Oleksa Gregory
CPSO#:
88628
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Ukrainian
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Department of Critical Care Medicine
CSB 2-124
8440 112th St N W
Edmonton AB T6G 2B7
Date Received: 28 Mar 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Mar 2018 |