THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:07:58 AM
Srour, Nadim
CPSO#:
88562
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
3120 Boulevard Taschereau
Greenfield Park, Quebec
J4V 2H1
Tel: (514) 465-4606
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:10 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2013 |