THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:53:05 AM
Yarascavitch, Blake Arden
CPSO#:
88552
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 289-426-3121
Fax: 905-540-5830
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BLAKE ARDEN YARASCAVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARASCAVITCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2015 |