THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:49:46 AM
Chow, King Yin
CPSO#:
88447
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2855 Markham Rd
Clarity Eye
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: 4166633937
Fax: 4166633731
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:20 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KING YIN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2014 |