THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:18:58 AM
Belliveau, Michel James-Rheal
CPSO#:
88414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Professional Centre
Suite 414
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 737-1000
Fax: (613) 731-9999
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL JAMES-RHEAL BELLIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLIVEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |