THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:41:26 AM
Pour Farzi, Reza
CPSO#:
88412
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, Farsi, Turkish
Education: Islamic Azad University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REZA POUR FARZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POUR FARZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2014 |