THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:51:59 PM
Ridley, Julia Zarina
CPSO#:
88401
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dance Ridley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 13 Jun 2008
EL - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |