THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:38:09 AM
Skendaj, Evis
CPSO#:
88360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Albanian, English
Education: Universiteti i Tiranes, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Oak Clinic
2524 Third line
Unit C2
Oakville ON L6M 0G8
Phone: (905) 827 7000
Fax: (905) 827 7755
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jan 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EVIS SKENDAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKENDAJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |