THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:42:25 AM
Benson, Carolyn Michelle
CPSO#:
88325
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 08 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2017 |