THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:43:29 AM
Gastaldo, Fernando
CPSO#:
88317
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Department of Radiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46521
Fax: (905) 527-5761
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
|
Active |