THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:00:25 AM
Bulakhtina, Elena Alexandrovna
CPSO#:
88309
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
28050 Grand River Ave
Beaumont Hospital
Emergency medicine residency progra
Farmington MI 48336-5919
United States
Phone: 947.521.8822
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Pathology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELENA ALEXANDROVNA BULAKHTINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULAKHTINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Update: As of February 22, 2018, Dr. Bulakhtina has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)