THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:30:08 AM
Kanji, Rajandra
CPSO#:
88296
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
15 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Kanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 10 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Apr 2011 |