THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:04:17 AM
Almenawer, Saleh Abdulmohsen Saleh
CPSO#:
88266
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
27 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Saleh Almenawer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2018 |