THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:39:25 AM
Turkistani, Yosra Abdulahad A
CPSO#:
88261
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jun 2008 to 23 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jun 2009 to 08 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Oct 2010 to 08 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Oct 2011 to 08 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2016 |