THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:56:37 AM
Bukhari, Majidah Abdulfattah Saber
CPSO#:
88253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2016 |