THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:53:17 PM
Flusk, David Victor
CPSO#:
88246
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
10 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 05 Jun 2008
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
EL - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2011 |