THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 15:42:06 PM
Kashgary, Abdullah Yousif A
CPSO#:
88227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
King Abdulaziz university Hospital
Jeddah 21421
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966535358575
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH YOUSIF A KASHGARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHGARY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |