THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:32:49 PM
Jayaram, Srinidhi Kadamby
CPSO#:
88219
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 822-4521
Fax: (519) 822-0030
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:25 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SRINIDHI KADAMBY JAYARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYARAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
EL - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
EL - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |