THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:41:57 AM
Lohmann, Tara Ellen
CPSO#:
88204
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
04 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Jul 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:02 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
EL - Respirology
Queen's University, 20 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
EL - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2023 |