THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:29:37 PM
March, Gerard Michael John
CPSO#:
88200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
429 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON N7T 5P1
Phone: (519) 336-7860
Fax: (519) 336-0020
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site |
Petrolia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GERARD MICHAEL JOHN MARCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2009 |