THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:12:01 AM
Tisseverasinghe, Annaliese
CPSO#:
88199
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill, ON L4J 1W3
Date Received: 07 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:22 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 24 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2015 |